VT H0774 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Meat Inspection, Delivery Of Liquid Fuels, Dairy Operations, And Animal Foot Baths
Title
An Act Relating To Meat Inspection, Delivery Of Liquid Fuels, Dairy Operations, And Animal Foot Baths
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment not concurred in | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2012-05-05 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-03 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-03 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 | |
2012-05-03 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-05-03 | Motion agreed to | |
2012-05-03 | Senator(s) Sears motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Agriculture recommendation of amendment; text | |
2012-05-03 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-05-03 | Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-03 | Question on Third proposal of amendment of Agriculture, as amended divided on request of Senator Benning | |
2012-05-03 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-05-03 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kittell; text | |
2012-05-03 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-05-03 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kittell; text | |
2012-05-03 | Reported favorably by Senator Carris for Committee on Finance | |
2012-05-03 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kittell for Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-05 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. McAllister of Highgate | |
2012-04-30 | Called up by Senator Kittell & placed on action calendar for May 1, 2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-20 | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Lyons | |
2012-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-04-18 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-04-12 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-29 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-03-28 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-28 | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to. | |
2012-03-27 | Rep. Branagan of Georgia reported for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-27 | Rep. Rep. Zagar of Barnard spoke for the committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-27 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-03-20 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/20/2012 |