VT H0773 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Veterans' Tax Exemption
Title
An Act Relating To Veterans' Tax Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/8/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/8/2012 | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Doyle | |
2012-04-28 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-28 | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance | |
2012-04-28 | Reported favorably by Senator Doyle for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/28/2012 | |
2012-04-28 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2012-04-28 | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-28 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-11 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-11 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-29 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-03-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-03-28 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Rep. Sharpe of Bristol reported for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-26 | Rep. Rep. Head of South Burlington spoke for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2012-03-27 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-03-20 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/20/2012 |