VT H0770 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The State's Transportation Program
Title
An Act Relating To The State's Transportation Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/10/2012 | |
2012-05-04 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mazza for Committee, text | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2012-05-02 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2012-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-20 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-23 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mazza, Kitchel, and Westman | |
2012-04-20 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2012-04-20 | Speaker appointed Brennan of Colchester, Potter of Clarendon and Corcoran of Bennington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-04-20 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Brennan of Colchester | |
2012-04-19 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-19 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 | |
2012-04-18 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-17 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-17 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-04-17 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as moved by Senator(s) Mazza | |
2012-04-17 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Mazza; text | |
2012-04-17 | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-17 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-17 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-13 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-12 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Mazza on behalf of Committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-12 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-11 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-04-10 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-10 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 0 | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-16 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-03-15 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/15/2012 |