VT H0768 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor on 4/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor on 4/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Ignition Interlock Restricted Driver's Licenses And Civil Suspensions
Title
An Act Relating To Ignition Interlock Restricted Driver's Licenses And Civil Suspensions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor on 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-19 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-04-18 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-17 | Reported favorably by Senator Snelling for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. Rep. French of Shrewsbury spoke for the committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-15 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/15/2012 |