VT H0766 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Rehabilitation Of Vermont National Guard Members And Certain Rights And Responsibilities Of Guard Members And Their Employers
Title
An Act Relating To The Rehabilitation Of Vermont National Guard Members And Certain Rights And Responsibilities Of Guard Members And Their Employers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Rep. Rep. Head of South Burlington spoke for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/11/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-05-05 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-04 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-04 | Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator MacDonald, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 12 | |
2012-05-04 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) MacDonald motion to amend proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-03 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-05-03 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to | |
2012-05-03 | Secs. 2 through 8 propsoals of amendment of Committee on Econ. Dev., Housing and Gen. Aff. agreed to | |
2012-05-03 | Sec. 1 of proposal of amendment of Economic Dev., Housing & General Affairs, agreed to | |
2012-05-03 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-05-03 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-30 | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading | |
2012-04-28 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-27 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-27 | Question divided on demand of Senator MacDonald | |
2012-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-04-27 | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-27 | Reported favorably by Senator Illuzzi for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-25 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-24 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-24 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-24 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Committed to Committee on Appropriations with report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-04 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-03-30 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-29 | Rep. Acinapura of Brandon reported for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-28 | Rep. Rep. Head of South Burlington spoke for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2012-03-29 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-14 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-03-13 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/13/2012 |