VT H0764 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-22 - Enacted without Governor's signature on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-22 - Enacted without Governor's signature on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to data brokers and consumer protection
Title
An act relating to data brokers and consumer protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 46 (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 56, Nays = 84 (Y: 56 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 46 (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 56, Nays = 84 (Y: 56 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Enacted without Governor's signature on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2018-05-12 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. |
2018-05-12 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2018-05-12 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-11 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Baruth for Committee, text |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Baruth, Balint, and Soucy |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-09 | House | Speaker appointed Botzow of Pownal, Marcotte of Coventry and O'Sullivan of Burlington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Botzow of Pownal |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | Read Third time |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-15 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 46 |
2018-02-15 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-02-15 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 56, Nays = 84 |
2018-02-15 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-15 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | House | Rep. Young of Glover recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-15 | House | Rep. Botzow of Pownal spoke for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-09 | House | Rep. Botzow of Pownal moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to. |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee Bill read first time |