VT H0761 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Executive Branch Fees, Including Motor Vehicle And Fish And Wildlife Fees
Title
An Act Relating To Executive Branch Fees, Including Motor Vehicle And Fish And Wildlife Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-23 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-21 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-21 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-20 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-19 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Branagan of Georgia | |
2012-04-12 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-12 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-11 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-11 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to | |
2012-04-11 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Westman for Committee on Finance | |
2012-04-11 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-10 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance | |
2012-04-10 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-23 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 111, Nays = 30 | |
2012-02-23 | Passed | |
2012-02-23 | Read Third time | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-02-22 | Rep. Sharpe of Bristol moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2012-02-22 | Rep. Branagan of Georgia spoke for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-02-22 | Read Second Time | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 2/20/2012 |