VT H0759 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Permitting The Use Of Secure Residential Recovery Facilities For Continued Involuntary Treatment
Title
An Act Relating To Permitting The Use Of Secure Residential Recovery Facilities For Continued Involuntary Treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/17/2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Passed the House and Senate on 5/1/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/14/2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-30 | House request that Senate recede from Senate proposal of amendment; agreed to | |
2012-04-30 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-27 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | House Message: House refuses to concur in Senate proposal of amendment and requests Senate to recede | |
2012-04-25 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-25 | Rep. French of Randolph moved that the House request that the Senate recede from its proposal of amendment which was agreed to | |
2012-04-20 | Action postponed until 4/25/2012 as moved by Rep. Martin of Springfield | |
2012-04-19 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-19 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-18 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-17 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-17 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to | |
2012-04-17 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-04-17 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-13 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-12 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-04-11 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Report of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. French of Randolph reported for the committee on Human Services | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. Martin of Springfield, recommended for the committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to the Committee on Human Services | |
2012-02-24 | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration | |
2012-02-15 | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to. | |
2012-02-15 | Rules suspended | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 2/15/2012 |