VT H0755 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Delivered to the Governor on 3/2/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Delivered to the Governor on 3/2/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Extending The Deadline For Adoption Of Certain Health Department Rules
Title
An Act Relating To Extending The Deadline For Adoption Of Certain Health Department Rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor on 3/2/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by Governor on 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Passed the House and Senate on 2/29/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ayer | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-02-29 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ayer | |
2012-02-29 | Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-02-29 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ayer | |
2012-02-16 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-02-10 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-02-10 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City withdrawn | |
2012-02-09 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-02-09 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Frank of Underhill agreed to | |
2012-02-09 | Rep. Frank of Underhill spoke for the committee on Human Services | |
2012-02-09 | Read Second Time | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 2/7/2012 |