VT H0746 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to an amendment to the charter of the City of Burlington
Title
An act relating to an amendment to the charter of the City of Burlington
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 105, Nays = 33 (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 105, Nays = 33 |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town demanded yeas and nays |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-29 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-08 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |