VT H0741 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to criminal record checks on contractors working in State-owned or -leased facilities
Title
An act relating to criminal record checks on contractors working in State-owned or -leased facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 23 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-10 - Senate - Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2020 |
2020-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor on April 28, 2020 |
2020-04-27 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 27, 2020 |
2020-04-24 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2020-04-23 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-04-13 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 23 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2020-04-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call, Required by Rule, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions agreed to |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Institutions |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2020-04-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |
2020-03-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-02-28 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to. |
2020-02-28 | House | Rep. Taylor of Colchester reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2020-02-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-01-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |