VT H0739 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment
Title
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Emmons of Springfield |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2022-05-09 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Rep. Coffey of Guilford moved to postpone action until May 7, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-05-05 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield moved to postpone action until May 5, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons, Hardy, and Kitchel agreed to |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senator Perchlik requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Hardy, and Kitchel |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be amended as recommended by Senator(s) Perchlik, Chittenden, Clarkson, Hardy, Hooker, MacDonald, Pearson, Pollina, and Ram Hinsdale ? |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Consideration postponed to later in the legislative day on motion of Senator MacDonald |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Perchlik, Chittenden, Clarkson, Hardy, Hooker, MacDonald, Pearson, Pollina, and Ram Hinsdale motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik, Chittenden, Clarkson, Hardy, Hooker, MacDonald, Pearson, Pollina, and Ram Hinsdale |
2022-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions agreed to |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Institutions |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2022-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Institutions intact, on motion of Senator Benning |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |
2022-03-29 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-29 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-25 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-25 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2022-03-25 | House | Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield spoke for the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-03-25 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-25 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-24 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee bill read first time |