VT H0730 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Consumer Protection Laws
Title
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Consumer Protection Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/14/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/11/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-05 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Illuzzi for Committee, text | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | Passed the House and Senate on 5/5/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. | |
2012-05-05 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2012-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Illuzzi, Ashe, and Campbell | |
2012-04-30 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2012-04-30 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-30 | Speaker appointed Marcotte of Coventry, Botzow of Pownal and Shand of Weathersfield as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Marcotte of Coventry | |
2012-04-28 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Russell of Rutland City | |
2012-04-26 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-25 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-24 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-24 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Illuzzi for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-21 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-20 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry spoke for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-02-01 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |