VT H0728 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Developmental Services' System Of Care
Title
An Act Relating To Developmental Services' System Of Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-07 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed |
2014-03-21 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-20 | House | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2014-03-20 | House | Rep. Manwaring of Wilmington reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-20 | House | Rep. French of Randolph reported for the committee on Human Services |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |