VT H0727 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the exploration, formation, and organization of union school districts and unified union school districts
Title
An act relating to the exploration, formation, and organization of union school districts and unified union school districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 40 (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: House adopted Conference Committee report |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, report of Committee of Conference adopted |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Perchlik for Committee, text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-07 | House | Senate Message, Committee of Conference members appointed |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Campion, Perchlik, and Terenzini |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House message: House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2022-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-06 | House | Speaker appointed Conlon of Cornwall, Toof of St. Albans Town and Brady of Williston as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2022-05-06 | House | Which was agreed to |
2022-05-06 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a Committee of Conference |
2022-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-06 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Perchlik, Campion, Chittenden, Hardy, Hooker, Lyons, and Terenzini |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik, Campion, Chittenden, Hardy, Hooker, Lyons, and Terenzini |
2022-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Education |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |
2022-03-18 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Peterson of Clarendon withdrawn |
2022-03-18 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-17 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 39 |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Cordes of Lincoln demanded yeas and nays |
2022-03-17 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2022-03-17 | House | Division results Yeas 46, Nays 73 |
2022-03-17 | House | Division demanded |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Leffler of Enosburgh, Colburn of Burlington, Cordes of Lincoln, Higley of Lowell, LaClair of Barre Town, Laroche of Franklin, Lefebvre of Orange, Mrowicki of Putney, Norris of Sheldon, Page of Newport City, Patt of Worcester, Small of Winooski, Strong of Albany, Surprenant of Barnard, Vyhovsky of Essex, and Yacovone of Morristown moved to amend the bill |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall reported for the Committee on Education |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Notice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 16, 2022 |