VT H0727 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the admissibility of a child’s hearsay statements in a proceeding before the Human Services Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the admissibility of a child’s hearsay statements in a proceeding before the Human Services Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
2018-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-09HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-09HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-09HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-09HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2018-05-09SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-09SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-08Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-05-08SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-07SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01HousePassed
2018-03-01HouseRead Third time
2018-02-28HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-28HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-02-28HouseRep. Rachelson of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-31HouseRep. Pugh of South Burlington moved that the committee on Human Services be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
2018-01-30HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback