VT H0725 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 5/18/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 5/18/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Farmers' Markets
Title
An Act Relating To Farmers' Markets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/12/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2010-04-27 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-23 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2010-04-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-04-22 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kittell agreed to | |
2010-04-22 | Reported favorably by Senator Kittell for Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-02-24 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment of Committee on Agriculture agreed to | |
2010-02-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Stevens of Shoreham agreed to | |
2010-02-23 | Rep. Stevens of Shoreham spoke for the committee on Agriculture | |
2010-02-23 | Read Second Time | |
2010-02-02 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture |