VT H0716 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Delivered to the Governor on July 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to Abenaki hunting and fishing licenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to Abenaki hunting and fishing licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-03 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 5 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on July 7, 2020
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2020-06-25SenateReported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2020-06-25SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-26SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-06-05HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-06-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-03HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 5
2020-06-03HouseReport of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife as amended agreed to
2020-06-03HouseRep. Burditt of West Rutland moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife which was disagreed to
2020-06-03HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Helm of Fair Haven disagreed to
2020-06-03HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester disagreed to
2020-06-03HouseReport of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
2020-06-03HouseRep. Lefebvre of Newark reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
2020-06-03HouseRead Second Time
2020-03-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2020-01-15HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback