VT H0716 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of the adoption of the charter of the Edward Farrar Utility District and the merger of the Village of Waterbury into the District
Title
An act relating to approval of the adoption of the charter of the Edward Farrar Utility District and the merger of the Village of Waterbury into the District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-05-12 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator White |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator White |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-02 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2018-05-02 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-25 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |