VT H0709 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 5/29/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 5/29/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Creating A Prekindergarten-16 Council
Title
An Act Relating To Creating A Prekindergarten-16 Council
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Clark [R] | Rep. Johannah Donovan [D] | Rep. Frank Geier [D] | Rep. Gary Gilbert [D] |
Rep. Timothy Jerman [D] | Rep. Anne Mook [D] | Rep. Peter Peltz [D] | Rep. Linda Waite-Simpson [D] |
Rep. John Zenie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on 5/29/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/24/2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-05 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-05 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-05-05 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to | |
2010-05-05 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education amended as moved by Senator(s) Starr | |
2010-05-05 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Starr; text | |
2010-05-05 | Reported favorably by Senator Doyle for Committee on Education with proposal of amendment | |
2010-05-05 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education | |
2010-05-05 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-05-04 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education | |
2010-05-04 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-05-03 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education | |
2010-05-03 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-26 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-03-23 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 49, Nays = 86 | |
2010-03-23 | Rep. Consejo of Sheldon demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-03-23 | Which was disagreed to. | |
2010-03-23 | Rep. Consejo of Sheldon, Turner of Milton, and Young of St. Albans City moved to amend the bill | |
2010-03-23 | Rep. McDonald of Berlin moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2010-03-23 | Rep. Fagan of Rutland City moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2010-03-23 | Second Instance of amendment disagreed to | |
2010-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Turner of Milton disagreed to | |
2010-03-23 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 38, Nays = 100 | |
2010-03-23 | Rep. Turner of Milton demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-03-23 | Rep. Turner of Milton asked that the question be divided | |
2010-03-23 | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to amend the bill | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-03-19 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 105, Nays = 36 | |
2010-03-19 | Rep. Peltz of Woodbury demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-03-19 | Amendment of Committee on Education agreed to | |
2010-03-19 | Rep. Miller of Shaftsbury spoke for the committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-19 | Rep. Peltz of Woodbury spoke for the committee on Education | |
2010-03-19 | Read Second Time | |
2010-03-18 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Donovan of Burlington | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2010-02-02 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |