VT H0708 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Message: Governor's veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Message: Governor's veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the approval of an amendment to the charter of the City of Burlington
Title
An act relating to the approval of an amendment to the charter of the City of Burlington
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 99, Nays = 51 (Y: 99 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 100 of 150 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 51 (Y: 99 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-18 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 49 (Y: 98 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 100 of 150 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 51 (Y: 99 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-18 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 49 (Y: 98 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House Message: Governor's veto sustained |
2022-05-10 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 100 of 150 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 51 |
2022-05-10 | House | Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 99, Nays = 51 |
2022-05-10 | House | Action Calendar: Governor’s Veto |
2022-05-05 | House | Rep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford moved to postpone action until May 10, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-05-05 | House | Action Calendar: Governor’s Veto |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House message: Governor vetoed bill on May 3, 2022 |
2022-05-03 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on May 3, 2022 |
2022-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Governor’s Veto |
2022-04-27 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-14 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-14 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-13 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-12 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ram Hinsdale for Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2022-02-22 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-02-18 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 49 |
2022-02-18 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2022-02-18 | House | Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to commit the bill to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs which was disagreed to |
2022-02-18 | House | Rep. Hooper of Burlington reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-02-18 | House | Read Second time |
2022-02-18 | House | Action Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Notice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 17, 2022 |