VT H0704 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to disclosure of compensation in job advertisements
Title
An act relating to disclosure of compensation in job advertisements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-21 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-20 | House | Report of Committee on General and Housing agreed to |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. Bartley of Fairfax reported for the Committee on General and Housing |
2024-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing |