VT H0700 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Open Meeting Law and meeting minutes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Open Meeting Law and meeting minutes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-01HousePassed
2018-03-01HouseRead Third time
2018-02-28HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-28HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2018-02-28HouseRep. Gardner of Richmond reported for the committee on Government Operations
2018-02-28HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-25HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback