VT H0696 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to establishing a State individual mandate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to establishing a State individual mandate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 118, Nays = 16 (Y: 118 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseSigned by Governor on May 28, 2018
2018-05-22HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 22, 2018
2018-05-12SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton.
2018-05-12HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
2018-05-12HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 118, Nays = 16
2018-05-12HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-12HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Lyons for Committee, text
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-04-27SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, MacDonald, and Sirotkin
2018-04-27SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2018-04-25HouseSpeaker appointed Briglin of Thetford, Donahue of Northfield and Jickling of Randolph as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-04-25HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Briglin of Thetford
2018-04-24HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Briglin of Thetford
2018-04-19HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-18SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-17Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-04-17SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2018-04-17SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2018-04-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-04-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-04-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-21SenateCommittee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Ayer
2018-03-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-03-14HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-13HouseReport of Committee on Health Care agreed to.
2018-03-13HouseRep. Briglin of Thetford recommended for the committee on Health Care
2018-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-24HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback