VT H0695 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Establishing A Product Stewardship Program For Primary Batteries
Title
An Act Relating To Establishing A Product Stewardship Program For Primary Batteries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 90 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-08 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Finance |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-26 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 129 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 39 |
2014-03-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-26 | House | Amendment of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2014-03-26 | House | Rep. Masland of Thetford reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | Rep. Yantachka of Charlotte reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-03-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |