VT H0688 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to addressing climate change

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to addressing climate change

Sponsors

Rep. Timothy Briglin [D]Rep. Selene Colburn [D]Rep. Sarah Copeland-Hanzas [D]Rep. Mary Hooper [D]
Rep. Martin LaLonde [D]Rep. Laura Sibilia [D]Rep. Janet Ancel [D]Rep. Peter Anthony [D]
Rep. Sarita Austin [D]Rep. John Bartholomew [D]Rep. Matt Birong [D]Rep. Thomas Bock [D]
Rep. Nelson Brownell [D]Rep. Jessica Brumsted [D]Rep. Mollie Burke [D]Rep. Scott Campbell [D]
Rep. James Carroll [D]Rep. Seth Chase [D]Rep. Robin Chesnut-Tangerman [D]Rep. Annmarie Christensen [D]
Rep. Kevin Christie [D]Rep. Brian Cina [D]Rep. Sara Coffey [D]Rep. Harold Colston [D]
Rep. Mari Cordes [D]Rep. Carl Demrow [D]Rep. Kari Dolan [D]Rep. Johannah Donovan [D]
Rep. David Durfee [D]Rep. Caleb Elder [D]Rep. John Gannon [D]Rep. Marcia Gardner [D]
Rep. Diana Gonzalez [D]Rep. Maxine Grad [D]Rep. Sandy Haas [D]Rep. Nader Hashim [D]
Rep. Matthew Hill [D]Rep. Philip Hooper [D]Rep. Robert Hooper [D]Rep. Lori Houghton [D]
Rep. Mary Howard [D]Rep. Kathleen James [D]Rep. Stephanie Jerome [D]Rep. Kimberly Jessup [D]
Rep. John Killacky [D]Rep. Warren Kitzmiller [D]Rep. Emilie Kornheiser [D]Rep. Jill Krowinski [D]
Rep. Diane Lanpher [D]Rep. William Lippert [D]Rep. Emily Long [D]Rep. Terence Macaig [D]
Rep. James Masland [D]Rep. Mike McCarthy [D]Rep. Curtis McCormack [D]Rep. James McCullough [D]
Rep. Michael Mrowicki [D]Rep. Logan Nicoll [D]Rep. Daniel Noyes [D]Rep. John O'Brien [D]
Rep. Jean O'Sullivan [D]Rep. Carol Ode [D]Rep. Kelly Pajala [I]Rep. Avram Patt [D]
Rep. David Potter [D]Rep. Ann Pugh [D]Rep. Barbara Rachelson [D]Rep. Zachariah Ralph [D]
Rep. Marybeth Redmond [D]Rep. Peter Reed [I]Rep. Robin Scheu [D]Rep. Amy Sheldon [D]
Rep. Trevor Squirrell [D]Rep. Thomas Stevens [D]Rep. Mary Sullivan [D]Rep. Randall Szott [D]
Rep. George Till [D]Rep. Tristan Toleno [D]Rep. Maida Townsend [D]Rep. Matthew Trieber [D]
Rep. Joseph Troiano [D]Rep. Tommy Walz [D]Rep. Kathryn Webb [D]Rep. Rebecca White [D]
Rep. Theresa Wood [D]Rep. David Yacovone [D]Rep. Michael Yantachka [D]

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-26SenateSenator Benning explained vote
2020-06-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-25Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 6
2020-06-25SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2020-06-25SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Nitka, Benning, and Sears; text
2020-06-25SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to
2020-06-25SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-25SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2020-06-25SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-06-26SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-06-25SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-06-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-06-24SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-06-23SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-06-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-02-21HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-02-20HouseReport of Committee on Energy and Technology as amended agreed to
2020-02-20HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 105, Nays = 37
2020-02-20HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
2020-02-20HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 44, Nays = 99
2020-02-20HouseRep. Savage of Swanton demanded yeas and nays
2020-02-20HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2020-02-20HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon demanded yeas and nays
2020-02-20HouseSecond instance of amendment agreed to
2020-02-20HouseFirst Instance of amendment disagreed to
2020-02-20HouseRep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the bill
2020-02-20HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2020-02-20HouseRep. Briglin of Thetford reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2020-02-20HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-01-14HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback