VT H0686 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to establishing the Child Fatality Review Team

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to establishing the Child Fatality Review Team

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 17, 2018
2018-04-17HouseSigned by Governor on April 17, 2018
2018-04-04HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2018-04-03SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2018-04-03SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-30SenateReported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2018-03-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-03-30SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-29SenateFavorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-03-29SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-09SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-02-07HousePassed
2018-02-07HouseRead Third time
2018-02-07HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-02-07HouseRep. Keefe of Manchester moved to amend the bill
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-06HouseReport of Committee on Human Services agreed to.
2018-02-06HouseRep. Keefe of Manchester reported for the committee on Human Services
2018-02-06HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback