VT H0681 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to government operations in response to the COVID-19 outbreak

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to government operations in response to the COVID-19 outbreak

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by Governor on March 30, 2020
2020-03-27SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2020-03-26HouseDelivered to the Governor on 3/26/2020
2020-03-25HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-25HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-03-25HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2020-03-25HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-03-24SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-03-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-03-24SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-03-24Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-03-24SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, Pollina, and White agreed to
2020-03-24SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, Pollina, and White; text
2020-03-24SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-24SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-03-24SenateRead First Time
2020-03-24HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town
2020-03-13HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-03-13HouseReport of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry
2020-03-13HouseRep. Jerome of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2020-03-13HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2020-01-14HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback