VT H0681 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 9, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 9, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Professional Regulation For Veterans, Military Service Members, And Military Spouses
Title
An Act Relating To The Professional Regulation For Veterans, Military Service Members, And Military Spouses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 9, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Hubert of Milton moved to postpone action until May 6, 2014 which was agreed to |
2014-05-01 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-18 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-14 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-01-24 | House | Rep. Head of South Burlington moved that the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to. |
2014-01-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |