VT H0674 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the definition of housesite for use value appraisals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the definition of housesite for use value appraisals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
2020-10-05HouseSigned by Governor on October 5, 2020
2020-09-30HouseDelivered to the Governor on September 30, 2020
2020-09-23HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-09-18HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-09-18SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-18SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-09-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-09-17Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-09-17SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2020-09-17SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2020-09-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-09-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-09-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-09-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-25SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2020-02-20HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-02-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-02-19HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to.
2020-02-19HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2020-02-19HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-18HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland
2020-01-14HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback