VT H0674 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by Governor on 5/4/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by Governor on 5/4/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to public notice of wastewater discharges
Title
An act relating to public notice of wastewater discharges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/4/16 |
2016-04-28 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 4/28/16 |
2016-04-20 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-04-20 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-04-15 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy agreed to |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-04-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-04-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-03-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-03-09 | House | Report of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to. |
2016-03-09 | House | Rep. Sheldon of Middlebury reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
2016-03-09 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-01-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |