VT H0663 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to municipal land use regulation of accessory on-farm businesses
Title
An act relating to municipal land use regulation of accessory on-farm businesses
Sponsors
Rep. Harvey Smith [R] | Rep. Carolyn Partridge [D] | Rep. Scott Beck [R] | Rep. Susan Buckholz [D] |
Rep. Rodney Graham [R] | Rep. Philip Hooper [D] | Rep. Richard Lawrence [R] | Rep. Terry Norris [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-09 | House | Action postponed until the end of the orders of the day as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as moved by Senator(s) Rodgers, Bray, Campion, MacDonald, and Pearson |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Rodgers, Bray, Campion, MacDonald, and Pearson; text |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Agriculture |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers, Bray, Campion, MacDonald, and Pearson |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers, Campion, MacDonald, and Pearson |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with the report of Committee on Agriculture intact, on motion of Senator Starr |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2018-02-09 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-08 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rep. Partridge of Windham reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2018-02-08 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-18 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |