VT H0656 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Professions And Occupations Regulated By The Office Of Professional Regulation
Title
An Act Relating To Professions And Occupations Regulated By The Office Of Professional Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-07 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed |
2014-03-19 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2014-03-18 | House | Rep. Evans of Essex moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to. |
2014-03-18 | House | Rep. Branagan of Georgia spoke for the committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-18 | House | Rep. Evans of Essex reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |