VT H0650 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Signed by Governor on July 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to boards and commissions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to boards and commissions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseSigned by Governor on July 1, 2020
2020-06-26HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 26, 2020
2020-06-19SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-19SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2020-06-19HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2020-06-19SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-18SenateReported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2020-06-18SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2020-06-18SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-06-17SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2020-06-17SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-03-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2020-03-12HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-12HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-03-12HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Elder of Starksboro, Webb of Shelburne, Batchelor of Derby, Cupoli of Rutland City, Giambatista of Essex, and James of Manchester agreed to
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-03-11HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2020-03-11HouseRep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2020-03-11HouseRead Second Time
2020-01-14HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback