VT H0650 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 3, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 3, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Establishing The Ecosystem Restoration And Water Quality Improvement Special Fund
Title
An Act Relating To Establishing The Ecosystem Restoration And Water Quality Improvement Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. David Deen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 3, 2014 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-04-23 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-17 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-16 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Snelling for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Snelling for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-04-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2014-03-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-11 | House | Amendment of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to |
2014-03-11 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-11 | House | Rep. Beyor of Highgate reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
2014-03-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |