VT H0645 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the expansion of approaches to restorative justice
Title
An act relating to the expansion of approaches to restorative justice
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Dolan [D] | Rep. Angela Arsenault [D] | Rep. Ela Chapin [D] | Rep. Kevin Christie [D] |
Rep. Martin LaLonde [D] | Rep. Barbara Rachelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-14 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-14 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-13 | House | Rep. Dolan of Essex Junction moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-03-13 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-13 | House | Report of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-13 | House | Rep. Squirrell of Underhill recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-13 | House | Rep. Andrews of Westford recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-13 | House | Rep. Dolan of Essex Junction reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-13 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-13 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-12 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-02-28 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-27 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes moved that the Committee on Appropriations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the Committee on Ways and Means, which was agreed to |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-20 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |