VT H0643 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - New Business/Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to banking and insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to banking and insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-05-26Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-05-26SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2020-05-26SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-05-26SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2020-05-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-03-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-03-13HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to.
2020-03-13HouseRep. Ralph of Hartland reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2020-01-17HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to commit bill to the committee on Health Care which was agreed to.
2020-01-17HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry
2020-01-10HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback