VT H0639 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to flood risk disclosure, accessibility standards for State-funded residential construction, housing accountability, and recovery residence evictions
Title
An act relating to flood risk disclosure, accessibility standards for State-funded residential construction, housing accountability, and recovery residence evictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-22 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-22 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-03-22 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2024-03-22 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell moved to amend the bill |
2024-03-22 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs moved to postpone action until 3/22/24, which was agreed to |
2024-03-21 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-20 | House | Report of Committee on General and Housing agreed to |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs reported for the Committee on General and Housing |
2024-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing |