VT H0638 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to increasing the number of examiners on the Board of Bar Examiners from nine to 11 members
Title
An act relating to increasing the number of examiners on the Board of Bar Examiners from nine to 11 members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-27 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-01-17 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |