VT H0627 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To An Opioid Addiction Treatment System
Title
An Act Relating To An Opioid Addiction Treatment System
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Pugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/14/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/11/2012 | |
2012-04-27 | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-04-25 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-23 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-21 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-20 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-20 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-20 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-04-20 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-13 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-04-13 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to and Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. Mrowicki of Putney reported for the committee on Human Services | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-27 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |