VT H0615 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prohibiting the use of drones near correctional facilities
Title
An act relating to prohibiting the use of drones near correctional facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Emmons [D] | Rep. Lynn Batchelor [R] | Rep. Paul Belaski [D] | Rep. Daniel Connor [D] |
Rep. Terence Macaig [D] | Rep. Marcia Martel [R] | Rep. Mary Morrissey [R] | Rep. Robin Scheu [D] |
Rep. Charles Shaw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-02 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rep. Belaski of Windsor reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2018-03-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-12 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |