VT H0608 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to incompatible local offices
Title
An act relating to incompatible local offices
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Ancel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 23, 2020 |
2020-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor on June 23, 2020 |
2020-06-18 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 18, 2020 |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2020-06-12 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2020-06-12 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-11 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2020-02-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-02-11 | House | Rep. Brownell of Pownal reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2020-02-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-01-07 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |