VT H0608 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to creating an Older Vermonters Act working group
Title
An act relating to creating an Older Vermonters Act working group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Signed by Governor on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton. |
2018-05-11 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury moved that the House recede from its Proposal of Amendment and concur in the Senate Proposal of Amendment which was agreed to |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate message, adheres to its position |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-10 | Senate | On motion of Senator Ingram, the Senate refused to concur and adhered |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-01 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-27 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-04-27 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury moved to concur with the Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2018-04-26 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Wood of Waterbury |
2018-04-24 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-04-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-28 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-28 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-02-28 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-27 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to |
2018-02-27 | House | Report of the Committee on Human Services amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury reported for the committee on Human Services |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-01-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |