VT H0607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Delivered to the Governor on September 29, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to increasing the supply of nurses and primary care providers in Vermont

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to increasing the supply of nurses and primary care providers in Vermont

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29HouseDelivered to the Governor on September 29, 2020
2020-09-25SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2020-09-25HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney.
2020-09-25HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-09-25HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-09-25HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-09-25SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-09-25SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-09-24Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-09-24SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2020-09-24SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-24SenateReported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2020-09-24SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-09-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-09-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-09-23SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-23SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-09-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-16SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-09-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-09-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-06-17SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-06-16HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-16HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-06-16HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-16HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-16HouseReport of Committee on Health Care as amended agreed to
2020-06-16HouseReport of the Committee on Health Care amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-16HouseRep. Reed of Braintree reported for the committee on Health Care
2020-06-16HouseRead Second Time
2020-05-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-03-24HousePlaced on Calendar for Notice on 3/24/2020
2020-01-07HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback