VT H0589 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Signed by Governor on April 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the reasonable and prudent parent standard

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the reasonable and prudent parent standard

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseSigned by Governor on April 20, 2018
2018-04-06HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2018-04-05SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2018-04-05SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-04SenateReported favorably by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2018-04-04SenateFavorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-04-04SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-03SenateFavorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-04-03SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-21SenateCommittee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Sears
2018-02-09SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-07HousePassed
2018-02-07HouseRead Third time
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-06HouseRecommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-02-06HouseRep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-02-06HouseRep. Troiano of Stannard reported for the committee on Human Services
2018-02-06HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-19HouseRep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
2018-01-19HouseRep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2018-01-09HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback