VT H0585 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to amending the pension system for sheriffs and certain deputy sheriffs
Title
An act relating to amending the pension system for sheriffs and certain deputy sheriffs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-26 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-26 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs agreed to |
2024-03-26 | House | Rep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-26 | House | Rep. McCarthy of St. Albans City reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-26 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-20 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-03 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |