VT H0581 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Connectivity Initiative grant eligibility
Title
An act relating to Connectivity Initiative grant eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Read Third time |
2018-02-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-16 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-02-16 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-16 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-02-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-16 | House | Called Up on motion of Rep. Carr of Brandon and placed on the Calendar for Action on February 16, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Ordered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Carr of Brandon |
2018-01-09 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |