VT H0581 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 3, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 3, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Guardianship Of Minors
Title
An Act Relating To Guardianship Of Minors
Sponsors
Rep. Sandy Haas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 3, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-02 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-01 | House | Rep. Grad of Moretown moved to postpone action until May 2, 2014 which was agreed to |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Galbraith motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Third Reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Nitka |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Flory and Nitka |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Flory and Nitka |
2014-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as moved by Senator(s) Nitka |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Consideration postponed until later in the day on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senator(s) Nitka motion to amend Committee on Judiciary proposal of amendment; text |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Nitka |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-02-20 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-02-20 | House | Report of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Human Services |
2014-02-20 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester reported for the committee on Human Services |
2014-02-20 | House | Rep. Goodwin of Weston reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-06 | House | Rep. Wizowaty of Burlington moved that the committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to. |
2014-02-06 | House | Rep. Wizowaty of Burlington moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-01-10 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |