VT H0577 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by Governor on 5/25/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by Governor on 5/25/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to voter approval of electricity purchases by municipalities and electric cooperatives
Title
An act relating to voter approval of electricity purchases by municipalities and electric cooperatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/25/16 |
2016-05-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/24/16 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2016-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-05-06 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-05-06 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons; text |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senator(s) Lyons motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Finance recommendation of amendment; text |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Substitute Recommendation/Proposal of amendment, by Committee on Finance |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-03-08 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-02-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-02-26 | House | Rep. Sullivan of Burlington reported for the committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-02-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-01-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |