VT H0577 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor on April 8, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor on April 8, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Ski Tramways
Title
An Act Relating To Ski Tramways
Sponsors
Rep. William Botzow [D] | Rep. Michael Marcotte [R] | Rep. Stephen Carr [D] | Rep. George Cross [D] |
Rep. Warren Kitzmiller [D] | Rep. Michele Kupersmith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Signed by Governor on April 8, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2014-03-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collins for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-01-29 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-01-28 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to postpone action until January 29, 2014 which was agreed to |
2014-01-24 | House | Amendment of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2014-01-24 | House | Rep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2014-01-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-01-10 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |